NE LB248 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Youth Opportunities in Learning and Occupations Act
Title
Adopt the Youth Opportunities in Learning and Occupations Act
Sponsors
Sen. Burke Harr [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2017-05-10 | Legislature | Halloran MO131 Bracket until June 2, 2017 filed |
2017-04-10 | Legislature | Harr AM936 lost |
2017-04-05 | Legislature | Harr AM936 pending |
2017-04-05 | Legislature | Harr AM936 filed |
2017-04-05 | Legislature | Business and Labor AM301 pending |
2017-03-08 | Legislature | Harr priority bill |
2017-02-28 | Legislature | Business and Labor AM301 filed |
2017-02-28 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM301 |
2017-01-13 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 23, 2017 |
2017-01-13 | Legislature | Referred to Business and Labor Committee |
2017-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=31171 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB248.pdf |