NE LB248 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Halloran MO131 Bracket until June 2, 2017 filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adopt the Youth Opportunities in Learning and Occupations Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopt the Youth Opportunities in Learning and Occupations Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-10LegislatureHalloran MO131 Bracket until June 2, 2017 filed
2017-04-10LegislatureHarr AM936 lost
2017-04-05LegislatureHarr AM936 pending
2017-04-05LegislatureHarr AM936 filed
2017-04-05LegislatureBusiness and Labor AM301 pending
2017-03-08LegislatureHarr priority bill
2017-02-28LegislatureBusiness and Labor AM301 filed
2017-02-28LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM301
2017-01-13LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 23, 2017
2017-01-13LegislatureReferred to Business and Labor Committee
2017-01-11LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback