NE LB245 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - Provisions/portions of LB244 amended into LB245 by AM197
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - Provisions/portions of LB244 amended into LB245 by AM197
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to motions for new trial and DNA testing of biological material
Title
Change provisions relating to motions for new trial and DNA testing of biological material
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-23 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 42-4-3 (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB244 amended into LB245 by AM197 |
2015-04-29 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 29, 2015 |
2015-04-28 | Legislature | Smith explanation of vote |
2015-04-23 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 23, 2015 |
2015-04-23 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2015-04-23 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 42-4-3 |
2015-04-07 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading Second |
2015-04-07 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Reengrossment |
2015-04-07 | Legislature | Pansing Brooks AM1070 adopted |
2015-04-07 | Legislature | Returned to Select File for specific amendment |
2015-04-07 | Legislature | Krist FA37 withdrawn |
2015-04-01 | Legislature | Pansing Brooks AM1070 filed |
2015-03-26 | Legislature | Krist FA37 filed |
2015-03-17 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST15 |
2015-03-12 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2015-03-12 | Legislature | Harr AM843 adopted |
2015-03-12 | Legislature | Harr AM843 filed |
2015-03-12 | Legislature | Harr AM827 withdrawn |
2015-03-12 | Legislature | Harr FA29 withdrawn |
2015-03-11 | Legislature | Harr AM827 filed |
2015-03-11 | Legislature | Harr FA29 pending |
2015-03-11 | Legislature | Harr FA29 filed |
2015-03-11 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER46 adopted |
2015-03-06 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER46 filed |
2015-03-06 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER46 |
2015-03-03 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2015-03-03 | Legislature | Judiciary AM197 adopted |
2015-02-10 | Legislature | Judiciary AM197 filed |
2015-02-10 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM197 |
2015-02-02 | Legislature | Chambers name added |
2015-02-02 | Legislature | Riepe name added |
2015-01-22 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 30, 2015 |
2015-01-15 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2015-01-14 | Legislature | Date of introduction |