NE LB244 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Approved by Governor on May 29, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Approved by Governor on May 29, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for mobile massage therapy establishments
Title
Provide for mobile massage therapy establishments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 45-0-4 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Legislature - Health and Human Services AM1214 adopted (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Legislature - Health and Human Services AM1214 adopted (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 29, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 23, 2019 |
2019-05-23 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-05-23 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 45-0-4 |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-05-16 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-05-16 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER121 adopted |
2019-05-13 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER121 filed |
2019-05-13 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER121 |
2019-05-10 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-05-10 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM1214 adopted |
2019-04-08 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM1214 filed |
2019-04-08 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1214 |
2019-02-27 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 27, 2019 |
2019-01-16 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-01-14 | Legislature | Date of introduction |