NE LB243 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by Governor on April 17, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by Governor on April 17, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Create the Healthy Soils Task Force and add a use for a fund
Title
Create the Healthy Soils Task Force and add a use for a fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 43-0-6 (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Legislature - Gragert MO49 prevailed (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Legislature - Chambers MO48 failed (Y: 1 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-04-03 - Legislature - Chambers MO47 failed (Y: 0 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-04-02 - Legislature - Chambers MO46 failed (Y: 1 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-04-02 - Legislature - Chambers MO44 failed (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-04-02 - Legislature - Motion to overrule the Chair failed (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-04-02 - Legislature - Hughes AM937 adopted (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Legislature - Gragert AM789 adopted (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Legislature - Agriculture AM640 adopted (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Legislature - Gragert MO49 prevailed (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Legislature - Chambers MO48 failed (Y: 1 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-04-03 - Legislature - Chambers MO47 failed (Y: 0 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-04-02 - Legislature - Chambers MO46 failed (Y: 1 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-04-02 - Legislature - Chambers MO44 failed (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-04-02 - Legislature - Motion to overrule the Chair failed (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-04-02 - Legislature - Hughes AM937 adopted (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Legislature - Gragert AM789 adopted (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Legislature - Agriculture AM640 adopted (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 17, 2019 |
2019-04-11 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 11, 2019 |
2019-04-11 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-04-11 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 43-0-6 |
2019-04-11 | Legislature | Chambers FA44 withdrawn |
2019-04-11 | Legislature | Chambers FA44 filed |
2019-04-11 | Legislature | Motion to return to Select File withdrawn |
2019-04-03 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-04-03 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-04-03 | Legislature | Gragert MO49 prevailed |
2019-04-03 | Legislature | Gragert MO49 Invoke cloture filed |
2019-04-03 | Legislature | Chambers MO48 failed |
2019-04-03 | Legislature | Chambers MO48 Reconsider the vote to recommit to committee filed |
2019-04-03 | Legislature | Chambers MO47 failed |
2019-04-03 | Legislature | Chambers MO47 Recommit to the Agriculture Committee filed |
2019-04-02 | Legislature | Chambers MO46 failed |
2019-04-02 | Legislature | Chambers MO46 Reconsider the vote to indefinitely postpone filed |
2019-04-02 | Legislature | Chambers MO44 failed |
2019-04-02 | Legislature | Chambers MO44 Indefinitely postpone filed |
2019-04-02 | Legislature | Motion to overrule the Chair failed |
2019-04-02 | Legislature | Chair ruled AM1142 is not germane to bill |
2019-04-02 | Legislature | Chambers AM1142 filed |
2019-04-02 | Legislature | Hughes AM937 adopted |
2019-04-02 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER57 adopted |
2019-03-25 | Legislature | Hughes AM937 filed |
2019-03-25 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER57 filed |
2019-03-25 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER57 |
2019-03-21 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-03-21 | Legislature | Gragert AM789 adopted |
2019-03-21 | Legislature | Agriculture AM640 adopted |
2019-03-20 | Legislature | Gragert AM789 filed |
2019-03-15 | Legislature | Gragert priority bill |
2019-03-15 | Legislature | Agriculture AM640 filed |
2019-03-15 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM640 |
2019-01-22 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 29, 2019 |
2019-01-16 | Legislature | Referred to Agriculture Committee |
2019-01-14 | Legislature | Date of introduction |