NE LB243 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - Provisions/portions of LB441 amended into LB243 by AM1045
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - Provisions/portions of LB441 amended into LB243 by AM1045
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Create a pilot project relating to family finding services and change the Young Adult Bridge to Independence Act
Title
Create a pilot project relating to family finding services and change the Young Adult Bridge to Independence Act
Sponsors
Sen. Kate Bolz [N] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-21 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 39-5-5 (Y: 39 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB441 amended into LB243 by AM1045 |
2015-05-27 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 27, 2015 |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 21, 2015 |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 39-5-5 |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2015-05-19 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading Second |
2015-05-19 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Reengrossment |
2015-05-19 | Legislature | Bolz AM1622 adopted |
2015-05-19 | Legislature | Returned to Select File for specific amendment |
2015-05-14 | Legislature | Bolz AM1622 filed |
2015-05-01 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST31 |
2015-04-29 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2015-04-29 | Legislature | Bolz AM1217 adopted |
2015-04-29 | Legislature | Bolz AM1045 adopted |
2015-04-29 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER78 adopted |
2015-04-14 | Legislature | Bolz AM1217 filed |
2015-04-13 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER78 filed |
2015-04-13 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER78 |
2015-04-10 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2015-04-10 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM787 adopted |
2015-04-10 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM787 pending |
2015-04-09 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM787 pending |
2015-04-01 | Legislature | Bolz AM1045 filed |
2015-03-12 | Legislature | Bolz priority bill |
2015-03-11 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM787 filed |
2015-03-11 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM787 |
2015-01-28 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 19, 2015 |
2015-01-15 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2015-01-14 | Legislature | Date of introduction |