NE LB241 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Lowe MO69 prevailed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adopt the Meatpacking Employees COVID-19 Protection Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopt the Meatpacking Employees COVID-19 Protection Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-18 - Legislature - Lowe MO69 prevailed (Y: 25 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 27 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Legislature - Vargas AM1163 adopted (Y: 31 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-18LegislatureLowe MO69 prevailed
2021-05-18LegislatureLowe MO69 Bracket until June 10, 2021 filed
2021-05-18LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER86 adopted
2021-05-12LegislatureBrandt AM1417 filed
2021-05-11LegislatureHansen, B. FA47 filed
2021-05-11LegislatureBrandt FA46 filed
2021-05-10LegislatureSlama AM1331 filed
2021-05-10LegislatureSlama AM1330 filed
2021-05-07LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER86 filed
2021-05-07LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER86
2021-05-06LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2021-05-06LegislatureVargas AM1163 adopted
2021-05-06LegislatureVargas AM1163 filed
2021-05-06LegislatureVargas AM580 withdrawn
2021-05-05LegislatureMcKinney name added
2021-05-05LegislatureCavanaugh, J. name added
2021-03-18LegislatureMcCollister name added
2021-03-17LegislaturePlaced on General File
2021-03-17LegislatureWalz name withdrawn
2021-03-16LegislatureSanders name withdrawn
2021-03-12LegislatureVargas priority bill
2021-03-11LegislatureVargas AM580 filed
2021-02-19LegislatureNotice of hearing for March 01, 2021
2021-01-14LegislatureSanders name added
2021-01-13LegislatureCavanaugh, M. name added
2021-01-13LegislatureReferred to Business and Labor Committee
2021-01-11LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=44065
Texthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/Intro/LB241.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/AM/AM580.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/AM/AM1163.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/AM/ER86.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/AM/AM1330.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/AM/AM1331.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/AM/FA46.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/AM/FA47.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/AM/AM1417.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/AM/MO69.pdf
Supplementhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/FN/LB241_20210226-114624.pdf
Supplementhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/SI/LB241.pdf
Supplementhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/CS/LB241.pdf
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=6939
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=6942
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=7089

Bill Comments

feedback