NE LB239 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-25 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-25 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to the use of handheld wireless communication devices under the Nebraska Rules of the Road
Title
Change provisions relating to the use of handheld wireless communication devices under the Nebraska Rules of the Road
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-25 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2021-01-19 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 26, 2021 |
2021-01-13 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2021-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |