NE LB237 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to the taxation of benefits received under the federal Social Security Act
Title
Change provisions relating to the taxation of benefits received under the federal Social Security Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Brewer [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2021-03-22 | Legislature | Wayne name added |
2021-02-09 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 25, 2021 |
2021-01-27 | Legislature | Hansen, B. name added |
2021-01-13 | Legislature | Bostar name added |
2021-01-13 | Legislature | Murman name added |
2021-01-13 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2021-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |