NE LB237 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Approved by Governor on May 08, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Approved by Governor on May 08, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to sales and use tax collection fees and authorize use of certain fees for revenue enforcement
Title
Change provisions relating to sales and use tax collection fees and authorize use of certain fees for revenue enforcement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 44-4-1 (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Legislature - Crawford AM1476 adopted (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Legislature - Albrecht FA47 lost (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 12 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Legislature - Crawford AM1319 adopted (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 12 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Legislature - Revenue AM676 adopted (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Legislature - Crawford AM1476 adopted (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Legislature - Albrecht FA47 lost (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 12 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Legislature - Crawford AM1319 adopted (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 12 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Legislature - Revenue AM676 adopted (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 08, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 02, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-05-02 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 44-4-1 |
2019-05-02 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2019-04-30 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-04-25 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-04-25 | Legislature | Crawford AM1476 adopted |
2019-04-25 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER88 adopted |
2019-04-24 | Legislature | Crawford AM1476 filed |
2019-04-17 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER88 filed |
2019-04-17 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER88 |
2019-04-16 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-04-16 | Legislature | Albrecht FA47 lost |
2019-04-16 | Legislature | Albrecht FA47 pending |
2019-04-16 | Legislature | Albrecht FA47 filed |
2019-04-16 | Legislature | Crawford AM1319 adopted |
2019-04-16 | Legislature | Crawford AM943 withdrawn |
2019-04-16 | Legislature | Revenue AM676 adopted |
2019-04-15 | Legislature | Crawford AM1319 filed |
2019-03-25 | Legislature | Crawford AM943 filed |
2019-03-20 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2019-03-15 | Legislature | Revenue AM676 filed |
2019-03-15 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM676 |
2019-02-13 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 22, 2019 |
2019-01-16 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2019-01-14 | Legislature | Date of introduction |