NE LB236 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Provisions/portions of LB301 amended into LB236 by AM1434
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Change provisions relating to controlled substances and firearms

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change provisions relating to controlled substances and firearms

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-21 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Legislature - Hansen, B. AM1434 adopted (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Legislature - Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM438 adopted (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Legislature - Brewer AM1388 adopted (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-27LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB301 amended into LB236 by AM1434
2021-05-27LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB244 amended into LB236 by AM1388
2021-05-27LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB173 amended into LB236 by AM1388
2021-05-27LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB85 amended into LB236 by AM1388
2021-05-26LegislatureApproved by Governor on May 26, 2021
2021-05-26LegislatureHansen, M. explanation of vote
2021-05-21LegislaturePresented to Governor on May 21, 2021
2021-05-21LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2021-05-21LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 45-0-4
2021-05-21LegislatureDispensing of reading at large approved
2021-05-19LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading with ST36
2021-05-18LegislatureBrandt name added
2021-05-18LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2021-05-18LegislatureHansen, B. AM1434 adopted
2021-05-18LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER98 adopted
2021-05-18LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER98 filed
2021-05-18LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER98
2021-05-12LegislatureHansen, B. AM1434 filed
2021-05-12LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2021-05-12LegislatureGovernment, Military and Veterans Affairs AM438 adopted
2021-05-12LegislatureBrewer AM1388 adopted
2021-05-12LegislatureBrewer AM874 withdrawn
2021-05-11LegislatureWilliams name added
2021-05-11LegislatureBrewer AM1388 filed
2021-05-10LegislatureAttorney General Opinion 21-011 to Brewer
2021-05-05LegislatureKolterman name added
2021-04-15LegislatureGragert name added
2021-04-15LegislatureAguilar name added
2021-04-14LegislatureFriesen name added
2021-04-14LegislatureBrewer AM874 filed
2021-03-18LegislatureLinehan name added
2021-03-15LegislatureDorn name added
2021-03-12LegislatureAlbrecht name added
2021-03-12LegislatureClements priority bill
2021-03-11LegislatureBostelman name added
2021-03-11LegislatureSanders name added
2021-03-11LegislatureGroene name added
2021-03-11LegislatureLowe name added
2021-03-09LegislatureBriese name added
2021-03-09LegislatureGovernment, Military and Veterans Affairs AM438 filed
2021-03-09LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM438
2021-02-26LegislatureMcDonnell name added
2021-02-25LegislatureHansen, B. name added
2021-02-16LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 24, 2021
2021-01-26LegislatureHalloran name added
2021-01-14LegislatureRereferred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
2021-01-13LegislatureMurman name added
2021-01-13LegislatureReferred to Judiciary Committee
2021-01-12LegislatureLindstrom name added
2021-01-11LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=43911
Texthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/Intro/LB236.pdf
Texthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/Final/LB236.pdf
Texthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/Slip/LB236.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/AM/AM438.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/AM/AM874.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/AM/AM1388.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/AM/AM1434.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/AM/ER98.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/AM/ST36.pdf
Supplementhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/SI/LB236.pdf
Supplementhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/FN/LB236_20210223-100126.pdf
Supplementhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/CS/LB236.pdf
Supplementhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/FN/LB236_20210325-082805.pdf
Supplementhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/FN/LB236_20210519-091041.pdf
Supplementhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/FN/LB236_20210520-094657.pdf
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=7042
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=7043
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=7044
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=7105
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=7263

Bill Comments

feedback