NE LB230 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-05 - Lippincott name added
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Require qualifying identification for voter registration and voting, require in-person voting, provide penalties, eliminate certain fees for state identification cards and certified copies of birth certificates, and change provisions relating to operators' licenses and state identification cards

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Require qualifying identification for voter registration and voting, require in-person voting, provide penalties, eliminate certain fees for state identification cards and certified copies of birth certificates, and change provisions relating to operators' licenses and state identification cards

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-05LegislatureLippincott name added
2024-01-03LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover bill
2023-02-21LegislatureNotice of hearing for March 01, 2023
2023-02-08LegislatureErdman AM281 filed
2023-02-01LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 08, 2023 (cancel)
2023-01-31LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 08, 2023
2023-01-12LegislatureReferred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
2023-01-10LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback