NE LB230 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Approved by Governor on February 12, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provide for room confinement of juveniles as prescribed

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for room confinement of juveniles as prescribed

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-06 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 44-0-5 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Legislature - Pansing Brooks AM2121 adopted (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 13 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Legislature - Judiciary AM450 adopted (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13LegislatureApproved by Governor on February 12, 2020
2020-02-06LegislatureWayne name added
2020-02-06LegislaturePresented to Governor on February 06, 2020
2020-02-06LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2020-02-06LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 44-0-5
2020-01-27LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2020-01-24LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2020-01-24LegislaturePansing Brooks AM2121 adopted
2020-01-24LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER141 adopted
2020-01-23LegislaturePansing Brooks AM2121 filed
2020-01-16LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER141 filed
2020-01-16LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER141
2020-01-14LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2020-01-14LegislatureJudiciary AM450 adopted
2020-01-08LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover bill
2019-02-26LegislatureJudiciary AM450 filed
2019-02-26LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM450
2019-02-13LegislatureHunt name added
2019-02-05LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 14, 2019
2019-01-16LegislatureReferred to Judiciary Committee
2019-01-14LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback