NE LB226 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change motor vehicle tax exemptions as prescribed under the Motor Vehicle Registration Act
Title
Change motor vehicle tax exemptions as prescribed under the Motor Vehicle Registration Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2021-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 01, 2021 |
2021-01-13 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2021-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |