NE LB226 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-27 - Approved by Governor on May 27, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-27 - Approved by Governor on May 27, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize crowdfunding as prescribed and exempt crowdfunding under the Securities Act of Nebraska
Title
Authorize crowdfunding as prescribed and exempt crowdfunding under the Securities Act of Nebraska
Sponsors
Sen. Colby Coash [N] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-21 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-27 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 27, 2015 |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 21, 2015 |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2015-05-19 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2015-05-19 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2015-05-19 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER133 adopted |
2015-05-15 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER133 filed |
2015-05-15 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER133 |
2015-05-14 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2015-05-14 | Legislature | Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM585 adopted |
2015-03-12 | Legislature | Murante priority bill |
2015-03-10 | Legislature | Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM585 filed |
2015-03-10 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM585 |
2015-01-23 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 02, 2015 |
2015-01-15 | Legislature | Mello name added |
2015-01-15 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2015-01-13 | Legislature | Date of introduction |