NE LB224 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Approved by Governor on April 23, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Approved by Governor on April 23, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions for appointment of a county surveyor in certain counties
Title
Change provisions for appointment of a county surveyor in certain counties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Legislature - Cavanaugh, M. MO30 failed (Y: 0 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-04-06 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Legislature - Cavanaugh, M. MO30 failed (Y: 0 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-04-06 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 23, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 20, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2021-04-20 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 |
2021-04-14 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2021-04-12 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2021-04-12 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO30 failed |
2021-04-12 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO30 Bracket until May 4, 2021 filed |
2021-04-07 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2021-04-06 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2021-02-16 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2021-01-19 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 28, 2021 |
2021-01-13 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2021-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |