NE LB223 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Approved by Governor on March 12, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Approved by Governor on March 12, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provide duties with regard to a state-sponsored insurance program for members of the Nebraska National Guard
Title
Provide duties with regard to a state-sponsored insurance program for members of the Nebraska National Guard
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Legislature - Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM61 adopted (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Legislature - Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM61 adopted (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 07, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-03-07 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 |
2019-03-04 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER26 adopted |
2019-02-19 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER26 filed |
2019-02-19 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER26 |
2019-02-08 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-02-08 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM61 adopted |
2019-02-05 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM61 filed |
2019-02-05 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM61 |
2019-01-23 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 30, 2019 |
2019-01-16 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2019-01-14 | Legislature | Date of introduction |