NE LB220 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB220 amended into LB743 by AM2066
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adopt the Insured Homeowners Protection Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopt the Insured Homeowners Protection Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB220 amended into LB743 by AM2066
2018-04-18LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2018-01-03LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover bill
2017-04-04LegislatureBanking, Commerce and Insurance AM567 filed
2017-04-04LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM567
2017-01-30LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 06, 2017
2017-01-12LegislatureReferred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee
2017-01-10LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback