NE LB217 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Provisions/portions of LB387 amended into LB217 by AM634
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Change revenue, taxation, economic development, and tax incentive provisions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change revenue, taxation, economic development, and tax incentive provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB387 amended into LB217 by AM634
2017-05-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB288 amended into LB217 by AM634
2017-05-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB251 amended into LB217 by AM993
2017-05-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB238 amended into LB217 by AM634
2017-05-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB233 amended into LB217 by AM634
2017-05-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB228 amended into LB217 by AM634
2017-05-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB49 amended into LB217 by AM634
2017-05-02LegislatureApproved by Governor on April 27, 2017
2017-04-24LegislaturePresented to Governor on April 24, 2017
2017-04-24LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2017-04-24LegislaturePassed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2
2017-04-24LegislatureDispensing of reading at large approved
2017-04-18LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading with ST17
2017-04-11LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2017-04-11LegislatureHarr AM993 adopted
2017-04-11LegislatureHarr AM993 filed
2017-04-11LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER48 adopted
2017-04-05LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER48 filed
2017-04-05LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER48
2017-03-30LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2017-03-30LegislatureHarr AM814 adopted
2017-03-30LegislatureHarr AM814 filed
2017-03-30LegislatureRevenue AM634 adopted
2017-03-22LegislatureRevenue AM634 filed
2017-03-22LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM634
2017-03-09LegislatureRevenue priority bill
2017-01-25LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 02, 2017
2017-01-12LegislatureReferred to Revenue Committee
2017-01-10LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback