NE LB215 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change 911 service surcharge provisions
Title
Change 911 service surcharge provisions
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Hughes [N] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - Legislature - Failed to advance to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 8 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2021-03-23 | Legislature | Failed to advance to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2021-03-23 | Legislature | Wayne MO15 withdrawn |
2021-03-23 | Legislature | Wayne MO15 Indefinitely postpone filed |
2021-03-16 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2021-03-12 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications priority bill |
2021-02-11 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 23, 2021 |
2021-01-13 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2021-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |