NE LB214 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Provisions/portions of LB214 amended into LB92 by AM1364
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Provisions/portions of LB214 amended into LB92 by AM1364
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt changes to federal law regarding banking and finance and change provisions relating to digital asset depositories, loan brokers, mortgage loan originators, and installment loans
Title
Adopt changes to federal law regarding banking and finance and change provisions relating to digital asset depositories, loan brokers, mortgage loan originators, and installment loans
Sponsors
Sen. Julie Slama [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB214 amended into LB92 by AM1364 |
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Indefinitely Postponed |
2023-03-30 | Legislature | Hunt MO383 Bracket until June 2, 2023 filed |
2023-03-30 | Legislature | Hunt MO380 Bracket until June 1, 2023 filed |
2023-03-30 | Legislature | Hunt MO384 Recommit to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee filed |
2023-03-30 | Legislature | Hunt MO382 Recommit to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee filed |
2023-03-30 | Legislature | Hunt MO379 Recommit to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee filed |
2023-03-30 | Legislature | Hunt MO381 Indefinitely postpone filed |
2023-03-30 | Legislature | Hunt MO378 Indefinitely postpone pursuant to Rule 6 Section 3(f) filed |
2023-03-29 | Legislature | Slama AM1026 filed |
2023-03-24 | Legislature | Slama FA32 filed |
2023-02-24 | Legislature | Banking, Commerce and Insurance priority bill |
2023-02-24 | Legislature | Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM398 filed |
2023-02-24 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM398 |
2023-01-13 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 23, 2023 |
2023-01-12 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2023-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |