NE LB211 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-23 - Approved by Governor on February 22, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-23 - Approved by Governor on February 22, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change sales and use tax provisions
Title
Change sales and use tax provisions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-23 | Approved by Governor on February 22, 2011 | |
2011-02-16 | Presented to Governor on February 16, 2011 | |
2011-02-16 | President/Speaker signed | |
2011-02-16 | Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 | |
2011-02-16 | Dispensing of reading at large approved | |
2011-02-14 | Placed on Final Reading | |
2011-02-10 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | |
2011-02-02 | Placed on Select File | |
2011-02-01 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2011-02-01 | Revenue AM26 adopted | |
2011-01-21 | Revenue AM26 filed | |
2011-01-21 | Placed on General File with AM26 | |
2011-01-12 | Notice of hearing for January 19, 2011 | |
2011-01-12 | Referred to Revenue Committee | |
2011-01-10 | Date of introduction |