NE LB207 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to the date when compensation begins under the Nebraska Workers' Compensation Act
Title
Change provisions relating to the date when compensation begins under the Nebraska Workers' Compensation Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2021-03-02 | Legislature | Hunt name added |
2021-02-19 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 01, 2021 |
2021-01-12 | Legislature | Referred to Business and Labor Committee |
2021-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |