NE LB207 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Provisions/portions of LB6 amended into LB207 by AM507
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Change provisions relating to powers and duties of the Office of Inspector General of Nebraska Child Welfare

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change provisions relating to powers and duties of the Office of Inspector General of Nebraska Child Welfare

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB6 amended into LB207 by AM507
2017-05-02LegislatureApproved by Governor on April 27, 2017
2017-04-24LegislaturePresented to Governor on April 24, 2017
2017-04-24LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2017-04-24LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 49-0-0
2017-04-05LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2017-04-03LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2017-04-03LegislatureKrist AM721 withdrawn
2017-04-03LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER20 adopted
2017-03-22LegislatureKrist AM721 filed
2017-03-22LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER20 filed
2017-03-22LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER20
2017-03-21LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2017-03-21LegislatureKrist AM507 adopted
2017-03-21LegislatureExecutive Board AM23 adopted
2017-03-07LegislatureKrist AM507 filed
2017-03-06LegislatureExecutive Board priority bill
2017-01-27LegislatureExecutive Board AM23 filed
2017-01-27LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM23
2017-01-13LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 20, 2017
2017-01-12LegislatureReferred to Executive Board
2017-01-10LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback