NE LB206 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Protect free speech rights of student journalists and student media advisers
Title
Protect free speech rights of student journalists and student media advisers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-31 - Legislature - Morfeld AM2136 adopted (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 13 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 12 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Legislature - Morfeld AM2093 adopted (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 13 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Legislature - Judiciary AM430 adopted (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 15 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 12 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Legislature - Morfeld AM2093 adopted (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 13 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Legislature - Judiciary AM430 adopted (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 15 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-31 | Legislature | Scheer FA93 filed |
2020-01-31 | Legislature | Clements AM2229 pending |
2020-01-31 | Legislature | Clements AM2229 pending |
2020-01-31 | Legislature | Clements AM2229 filed |
2020-01-31 | Legislature | Morfeld AM2136 adopted |
2020-01-31 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER140 adopted |
2020-01-23 | Legislature | Hansen, M. name added |
2020-01-23 | Legislature | Morfeld AM2136 filed |
2020-01-16 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER140 filed |
2020-01-16 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER140 |
2020-01-14 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2020-01-14 | Legislature | Morfeld AM2093 adopted |
2020-01-14 | Legislature | Morfeld AM2093 filed |
2020-01-14 | Legislature | Morfeld AM2066 withdrawn |
2020-01-14 | Legislature | Judiciary AM430 adopted |
2020-01-10 | Legislature | Morfeld AM2066 filed |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-02-26 | Legislature | Judiciary AM430 filed |
2019-02-26 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM430 |
2019-01-23 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 01, 2019 |
2019-01-15 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |