NE LB204 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-01-30 - Notice of hearing for February 15, 2017
Pending: Legislature Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Change provisions relating to appeals to the Supreme Court, service on employees of the state, and summary judgment

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change provisions relating to appeals to the Supreme Court, service on employees of the state, and summary judgment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-30LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 15, 2017
2017-01-12LegislatureReferred to Judiciary Committee
2017-01-10LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback