NE LB202 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designate funds appropriated to the Department of Health and Human Services for state aid
Title
Designate funds appropriated to the Department of Health and Human Services for state aid
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB202 amended into LB293 by AM1503 |
2019-03-14 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 26, 2019 |
2019-01-15 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2019-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=37207 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB202.pdf |