NE LB200 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-28 - Approved by Governor on May 27, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-28 - Approved by Governor on May 27, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change the distribution of sales and use tax revenue and provide duties for the Department of Revenue
Title
Change the distribution of sales and use tax revenue and provide duties for the Department of Revenue
Sponsors
Sen. Al Davis [N] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-21 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-28 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 27, 2015 |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 21, 2015 |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 |
2015-05-19 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2015-05-19 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2015-05-19 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER134 adopted |
2015-05-18 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER134 filed |
2015-05-18 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER134 |
2015-05-14 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2015-05-14 | Legislature | Revenue AM646 adopted |
2015-03-16 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2015-03-04 | Legislature | Revenue AM646 filed |
2015-03-04 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM646 |
2015-01-27 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 20, 2015 |
2015-01-15 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2015-01-13 | Legislature | Date of introduction |