NE LB20 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for insurance coverage of and medicaid access to prescribed contraceptives
Title
Provide for insurance coverage of and medicaid access to prescribed contraceptives
Sponsors
Sen. Carol Blood [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2021-03-11 | Legislature | Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM585 filed |
2021-03-11 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM585 |
2021-02-10 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 01, 2021 |
2021-02-01 | Legislature | Hansen, M. name added |
2021-01-15 | Legislature | Pansing Brooks name added |
2021-01-14 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, J. name added |
2021-01-12 | Legislature | Day name added |
2021-01-12 | Legislature | Hunt name added |
2021-01-11 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2021-01-07 | Legislature | Date of introduction |