NE LB196 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Provisions/portions of LB196 amended into LB140 by AM437
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revise powers of state-chartered banks, building and loan associations, and credit unions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise powers of state-chartered banks, building and loan associations, and credit unions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB196 amended into LB140 by AM437
2017-05-23LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2017-05-23LegislatureMotion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone prevailed
2017-05-17LegislatureMotion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone filed
2017-01-24LegislaturePlaced on General File
2017-01-13LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 23, 2017
2017-01-12LegislatureReferred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee
2017-01-10LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback