NE LB196 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Provisions/portions of LB196 amended into LB140 by AM437
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Provisions/portions of LB196 amended into LB140 by AM437
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise powers of state-chartered banks, building and loan associations, and credit unions
Title
Revise powers of state-chartered banks, building and loan associations, and credit unions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB196 amended into LB140 by AM437 |
2017-05-23 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2017-05-23 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone prevailed |
2017-05-17 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone filed |
2017-01-24 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2017-01-13 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 23, 2017 |
2017-01-12 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2017-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=30980 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB196.pdf |