NE LB195 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Approved by Governor on April 26, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Require notification following mammography as prescribed

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Require notification following mammography as prescribed

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-26LegislatureApproved by Governor on April 26, 2017
2017-04-24LegislaturePresented to Governor on April 24, 2017
2017-04-24LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2017-04-24LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 48-0-1
2017-04-10LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2017-04-03LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2017-03-09LegislaturePlaced on Select File
2017-03-08LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2017-03-08LegislatureCraighead AM547 adopted
2017-03-08LegislatureCraighead AM547 filed
2017-02-24LegislatureCraighead priority bill
2017-02-08LegislaturePlaced on General File
2017-01-23LegislatureHilkemann name added
2017-01-13LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 20, 2017
2017-01-12LegislatureReferred to Health and Human Services Committee
2017-01-10LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback