NE LB194 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Approved by Governor on April 19, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Approved by Governor on April 19, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions of the Credit Services Organization Act, Delayed Deposit Services Licensing Act, and Nebraska Installment Loan Act
Title
Change provisions of the Credit Services Organization Act, Delayed Deposit Services Licensing Act, and Nebraska Installment Loan Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Vargas [N] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 19, 2018 |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 18, 2018 |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0 |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2018-04-10 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST71 |
2018-04-10 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2018-04-10 | Legislature | Vargas AM2905 adopted |
2018-04-10 | Legislature | Vargas AM2905 filed |
2018-04-10 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER180 adopted |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER180 filed |
2018-04-09 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER180 |
2018-04-06 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2018-04-06 | Legislature | Lindstrom AM2872 adopted |
2018-04-06 | Legislature | Lindstrom AM2872 filed |
2018-04-06 | Legislature | Lindstrom AM2792 withdrawn |
2018-04-06 | Legislature | Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM2587 adopted |
2018-04-04 | Legislature | Lindstrom AM2792 filed |
2018-03-28 | Legislature | Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM2587 filed |
2018-03-28 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2587 |
2018-02-20 | Legislature | Vargas priority bill |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2017-02-14 | Legislature | Pansing Brooks name added |
2017-02-02 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 21, 2017 |
2017-01-19 | Legislature | Blood name added |
2017-01-19 | Legislature | Albrecht name added |
2017-01-12 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2017-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |