NE LB193 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Approved by Governor on February 14, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Change provisions relating to courts

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change provisions relating to courts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-08 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-15LegislatureApproved by Governor on February 14, 2018
2018-02-08LegislaturePresented to Governor on February 08, 2018
2018-02-08LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2018-02-08LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 48-0-1
2018-02-08LegislatureDispensing of reading at large approved
2018-01-31LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2018-01-26LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2018-01-26LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER95 adopted
2018-01-23LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER95 filed
2018-01-23LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER95
2018-01-16LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2018-01-16LegislatureJudiciary AM221 adopted
2018-01-03LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover bill
2017-02-22LegislatureJudiciary AM221 filed
2017-02-22LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM221
2017-01-24LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 10, 2017
2017-01-12LegislatureReferred to Judiciary Committee
2017-01-10LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback