NE LB191 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Provisions/portions of LB191 amended into LB289 by AM599
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provide for renewals of domestic violence protection orders

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for renewals of domestic violence protection orders

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB191 amended into LB289 by AM599
2017-05-23LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2017-05-23LegislatureMotion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone prevailed
2017-05-17LegislatureMotion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone filed
2017-03-13LegislaturePlaced on General File
2017-01-30LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 23, 2017
2017-01-26LegislatureMcDonnell name added
2017-01-12LegislatureReferred to Judiciary Committee
2017-01-10LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback