NE LB19 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allow withholding from public of reports of injury under the Nebraska Workers' Compensation Act as prescribed and provide duties for the Nebraska Workers' Compensation Court
Title
Allow withholding from public of reports of injury under the Nebraska Workers' Compensation Act as prescribed and provide duties for the Nebraska Workers' Compensation Court
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Briese [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 25, 2019 |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 18, 2019 (cancel) |
2019-02-08 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 18, 2019 |
2019-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Business and Labor Committee |
2019-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=37338 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB19.pdf |