NE LB188 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-12 - Clements name added
Pending: Legislature Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adopt the Second Amendment Preservation Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopt the Second Amendment Preservation Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-12LegislatureClements name added
2021-02-26LegislatureLindstrom name added
2021-02-24LegislatureSlama name added
2021-02-23LegislatureErdman name added
2021-02-19LegislatureHansen, B. name added
2021-02-16LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 24, 2021
2021-02-09LegislatureBriese name added
2021-02-04LegislatureLowe name added
2021-01-27LegislatureGroene name added
2021-01-13LegislatureBrewer name added
2021-01-12LegislatureReferred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
2021-01-08LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback