NE LB187 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Provisions/portions of LB187 amended into LB148 by AM192
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Increase a dollar threshold for transactions exempt from registration under the Securities Act of Nebraska, provide for an annual adjustment to such amount, and provide for the effect of exempt sales on malpractice premiums

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increase a dollar threshold for transactions exempt from registration under the Securities Act of Nebraska, provide for an annual adjustment to such amount, and provide for the effect of exempt sales on malpractice premiums

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB187 amended into LB148 by AM192
2017-05-23LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2017-05-23LegislatureMotion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone prevailed
2017-05-17LegislatureMotion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone filed
2017-02-02LegislaturePlaced on General File
2017-01-23LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 31, 2017
2017-01-12LegislatureReferred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee
2017-01-10LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback