NE LB184 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Approved by Governor on May 17, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Approved by Governor on May 17, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Small Wireless Facilities Deployment Act
Title
Adopt the Small Wireless Facilities Deployment Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-13 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 44-0-5 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Legislature - Friesen AM1470 adopted (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Legislature - Transportation and Telecommunications AM1252 adopted (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Legislature - Friesen AM1470 adopted (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Legislature - Transportation and Telecommunications AM1252 adopted (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-13 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 13, 2019 |
2019-05-13 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-05-13 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 44-0-5 |
2019-05-13 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2019-05-07 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST22 |
2019-05-02 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-05-02 | Legislature | Friesen AM1470 adopted |
2019-05-02 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER101 adopted |
2019-05-01 | Legislature | Friesen AM1470 filed |
2019-04-30 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER101 filed |
2019-04-30 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER101 |
2019-04-23 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-04-23 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications AM1252 adopted |
2019-04-23 | Legislature | Wayne MO35 withdrawn |
2019-04-10 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications AM1252 filed |
2019-04-10 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1252 |
2019-03-27 | Legislature | Wayne MO35 Indefinitely postpone pursuant to Rule 6, Sec. 3(f) filed |
2019-03-19 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications priority bill |
2019-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 04, 2019 |
2019-01-15 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2019-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |