NE LB184 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Approved by Governor on March 29, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Approved by Governor on March 29, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to loan brokerage agreements, disclosure documents, and rights to cancel
Title
Change provisions relating to loan brokerage agreements, disclosure documents, and rights to cancel
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 29, 2017 |
2017-03-23 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 23, 2017 |
2017-03-23 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2017-03-23 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 |
2017-03-15 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST1 |
2017-03-13 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2017-03-13 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER15 adopted |
2017-03-03 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER15 filed |
2017-03-03 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER15 |
2017-02-24 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2017-01-24 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2017-01-13 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 23, 2017 |
2017-01-12 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2017-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |