NE LB181 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-06 - Quick MO50 approved
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provide for reimbursement to employees for certain medical examinations under the Nebraska Workers' Compensation Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for reimbursement to employees for certain medical examinations under the Nebraska Workers' Compensation Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-06LegislatureQuick MO50 approved
2017-03-06LegislatureQuick MO50 Unanimous consent to bracket until January 10, 2018 filed
2017-02-23LegislatureQuick priority bill
2017-02-09LegislaturePlaced on General File
2017-01-13LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 23, 2017
2017-01-12LegislatureReferred to Business and Labor Committee
2017-01-10LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback