NE LB180 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Approved by Governor on April 23, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Approved by Governor on April 23, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to certain public statements of the Tax Commissioner and certain estimates of General Fund net receipts
Title
Change provisions relating to certain public statements of the Tax Commissioner and certain estimates of General Fund net receipts
Sponsors
Sen. Lou Linehan [N] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 23, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 20, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2021-04-20 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 |
2021-04-14 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2021-04-12 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2021-04-07 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2021-04-06 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2021-03-10 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2021-02-17 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 03, 2021 |
2021-01-12 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2021-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |