NE LB177 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Approved by Governor on February 14, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Approved by Governor on February 14, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to apportionable and fleet vehicles, motor fuel tax collections and enforcement, and powers and duties of the Director of Motor Vehicles
Title
Change provisions relating to apportionable and fleet vehicles, motor fuel tax collections and enforcement, and powers and duties of the Director of Motor Vehicles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-08 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on February 14, 2018 |
2018-02-08 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on February 08, 2018 |
2018-02-08 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2018-02-08 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 |
2018-02-08 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2018-01-30 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2018-01-26 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2018-01-26 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER94 adopted |
2018-01-17 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER94 filed |
2018-01-17 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER94 |
2018-01-10 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2017-02-06 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2017-01-13 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 24, 2017 |
2017-01-12 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2017-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |