NE LB174 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Raybould name added
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Eliminate the statute of limitations on certain civil actions for sexual assault of a child

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eliminate the statute of limitations on certain civil actions for sexual assault of a child

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-09LegislatureRaybould name added
2024-01-03LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover bill
2023-02-15LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 22, 2023
2023-01-11LegislatureReferred to Judiciary Committee
2023-01-09LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback