NE LB168 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to sports wagering and distribution of taxes collected from sports wagering on instate collegiate sporting events
Title
Change provisions relating to sports wagering and distribution of taxes collected from sports wagering on instate collegiate sporting events
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2023-02-03 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 13, 2023 |
2023-01-17 | Legislature | Aguilar name added |
2023-01-11 | Legislature | Referred to General Affairs Committee |
2023-01-09 | Legislature | Date of introduction |