NE LB166 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit defendant's discovery of victim's actual or perceived gender or sexual orientation as defense to crime
Title
Prohibit defendant's discovery of victim's actual or perceived gender or sexual orientation as defense to crime
Sponsors
Sen. Megan Hunt [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-01-30 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 07, 2019 |
2019-01-15 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=36949 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB166.pdf |