NE LB166 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Approved by Governor on April 27, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Approved by Governor on April 27, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions of Uniform Controlled Substances Act and Pharmacy Practice Act
Title
Change provisions of Uniform Controlled Substances Act and Pharmacy Practice Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 49-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 49-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 49-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 27, 2017 |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 24, 2017 |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 49-0-0 |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2017-04-10 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2017-04-04 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2017-04-04 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER37 adopted |
2017-03-31 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER37 filed |
2017-03-31 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER37 |
2017-03-28 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2017-03-28 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM143 adopted |
2017-03-13 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2017-02-24 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM143 filed |
2017-02-24 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM143 |
2017-01-18 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 27, 2017 |
2017-01-12 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2017-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |