NE LB162 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Judiciary AM3249 filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibit tampering with electronic monitoring devices required by court order or as a condition of parole

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibit tampering with electronic monitoring devices required by court order or as a condition of parole

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-03LegislatureJudiciary AM3249 filed
2024-04-03LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM3249
2024-01-03LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover bill
2023-03-09LegislatureNotice of hearing for March 16, 2023
2023-01-11LegislatureReferred to Judiciary Committee
2023-01-09LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback