NE LB161 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Title printed. Carryover bill
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Title printed. Carryover bill
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions of the Workplace Privacy Act
Title
Change provisions of the Workplace Privacy Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2023-02-16 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2023-01-20 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 30, 2023 |
2023-01-11 | Legislature | Referred to Business and Labor Committee |
2023-01-09 | Legislature | Date of introduction |