NE LB160 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Provisions/portions of LB160 amended into LB103 by AM1238
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Provisions/portions of LB160 amended into LB103 by AM1238
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change contribution rates relating to supplemental retirement plans for certain law enforcement personnel under the County Employees Retirement Act
Title
Change contribution rates relating to supplemental retirement plans for certain law enforcement personnel under the County Employees Retirement Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB160 amended into LB103 by AM1238 |
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Indefinitely Postponed |
2023-04-06 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2023-02-07 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 14, 2023 |
2023-01-11 | Legislature | Referred to Nebraska Retirement Systems Committee |
2023-01-09 | Legislature | Date of introduction |